Government Of Nepal
Ministry of Finance
Office of the Comptroller General
Office of the Comptroller of the Treasury and Accounts
Jajarkot
Devendra Raj Sharma
कोष नियन्त्रक
देखि सम्म
Bishnu Prasad Dawadi
कोष नियन्त्रक
देखि सम्म
Narayan Prasad Neupane
निमित्त कोष नियन्त्रक
देखि सम्म
Ram Krishna Panthi
कोष नियन्त्रक
देखि सम्म
Diwakar Lamsal
कोष नियन्त्रक
देखि सम्म
Bhisma Prasad Neupane
कोष नियन्त्रक
देखि सम्म
Dip Bahadur Adhikari
कोष नियन्त्रक
देखि सम्म
Hemraj Subedi
कोष नियन्त्रक
देखि सम्म
Dasharath Subedi
निमित्त कोष नियन्त्रक
देखि सम्म
Prayagraj Regmi
का.मु.कोष नियन्त्रक
देखि सम्म
Lok Raj Paudel
कोष नियन्त्रक
देखि सम्म
Dilliraj Sharma
कोष नियन्त्रक
देखि सम्म
Krishna Prasad Sharma
निमित्त कोष नियन्त्रक
देखि सम्म
Dipak Lamichane
कोष नियन्त्रक
2056-05-18 00:00:00देखि 2060-08-30 00:00:00 सम्म
Narad Bahadur Karki
निमित्त कोष नियन्त्रक
2060-05-01 00:00:00देखि 2061-01-10 00:00:00 सम्म
Bishnu Prasad Niraula
कोष नियन्त्रक
2061-01-11 00:00:00देखि 2062-12-28 00:00:00 सम्म
Man Bahadur Budha
निमित्त कोष नियन्त्रक
2062-12-29 00:00:00देखि 2063-06-07 00:00:00 सम्म
Ishwori Pande
कोष नियन्त्रक
2063-06-08 00:00:00देखि 2066-04-20 00:00:00 सम्म
Raj Bahadur Hamal
निमित्त कोष नियन्त्रक
2066-04-21 00:00:00देखि 2067-04-24 00:00:00 सम्म
Ujjywolraj Panthi
कोष नियन्त्रक
2067-04-25 00:00:00देखि 2069-01-21 00:00:00 सम्म
Kali Bahadur Giri
निमित्त कोष नियन्त्रक
2069-01-22 00:00:00देखि 2069-02-17 00:00:00 सम्म
Jayaprasad Pande
निमित्त कोष नियन्त्रक
2071-06-08 00:00:00देखि 2071-07-23 00:00:00 सम्म
Yam Bahadur Budha
कोष नियन्त्रक
2071-07-24 00:00:00देखि 2074-12-02 00:00:00 सम्म
Yam Bahadur Thapa
कोष नियन्त्रक
2075-01-04 00:00:00देखि 2077-05-31 00:00:00 सम्म
Ashok Kumar Rana
कोष नियन्त्रक
2077-06-26 00:00:00देखि 2077-08-28 00:00:00 सम्म
Naresh Raj Batta
कोष नियन्त्रक
2077-09-26 00:00:00देखि 2078-11-02 00:00:00 सम्म
Shova Shah
निमित्त कोष नियन्त्रक
2078-11-06 00:00:00देखि 2079-02-05 00:00:00 सम्म
Bir Shamsher Gharti
कोष नियन्त्रक
2079-02-06 00:00:00देखि 2081-01-16 00:00:00 सम्म